VA HB1304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public School Educational Technology Grants Program; leases of educational technology. Permits eligible school divisions to apply for grants to lease educational technology under the Virginia Public School Educational Technology Grants Program. Under current law, such grants are available only for the acquisition and replacement of educational technology.
Title
Virginia Public School Educational Technology Grants Program; leases of educational technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-11-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100235D |