VA HB1243 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0657)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0657)
Summary
Civil remedial fees on certain drivers. Repeals ยง 46.2-206.1, which provides for the imposition of civil remedial fees on certain drivers. The bill provides for the Comptroller to issue a refund to persons who have already paid all or part of the civil remedial fees ordered to be paid by a court. It directs the court clerk of the court that ordered the fees and the Department of Motor Vehicles to credit the accounts of persons who still owe civil remedial fees so as to indicate that the fees have been paid and are no longer outstanding. The Department of Motor Vehicles is also directed to reinstate the driver's license to any person whose license was suspended solely for failure to pay civil remedial fees. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Civil remedial fees; repeals provision for those imposed on certain drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0657) | |
2008-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 657 (effective 3/27/08) | |
2008-03-19 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-18 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1243ER) | |
2008-03-18 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: 4/5 affirmative votes required for passage | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (29-Y 11-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2008-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | House: Conference substitute printed 086031548-H1 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Hugo, Athey, Melvin | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Petersen, Houck, Reynolds | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1243S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 089609264-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 089609264-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-29 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-29 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Printed as engrossed 086973548-E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1243E | |
2008-01-28 | House: Emergency clause added | |
2008-01-28 | House: Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to | |
2008-01-28 | House: Passed by motion rejected | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086973548 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1243 |