VA HB1239 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real and personal property tax exemption; solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices. Exempts from real and personal property tax business-owned or business-operated solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices that collect, generate, transfer, or store thermal or electric energy.
Title
Real and personal property taxes; exemption for solar energy equipment, facilities, or devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 1/1/15) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1239ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1239H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104699D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104699D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103597D |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0259)