VA HB1130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia - Korea Advisory Board. Establishes the Virginia - Korea Advisory Board to advise the Governor on ways to improve mutually beneficial trade relationships between the Commonwealth and the Republic of Korea (South Korea).
Title
Virginia - Korea Advisory Board; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103740D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports