UT SB0153 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Idling Amendments
Title
Idling Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Nate Blouin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Substituted Bill |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Commercial Motor Vehicle Regulation
Counties
Emissions Control
Environment
Health and Human Services
Local Government Ordinances
Local Health Departments
Motor Vehicles
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation
Commercial Motor Vehicle Regulation
Counties
Emissions Control
Environment
Health and Human Services
Local Government Ordinances
Local Health Departments
Motor Vehicles
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Transportation