US SR92 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2457)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2457)
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on the Judiciary from: (1) March 1, 2013, through September 30, 2013; (2) October 1, 2013, through September 30, 2014; and (3) October 1, 2014, through February 28, 2015.
Title
A resolution authorizing the expenditures by the Committee on the Judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S2457) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 34. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Leahy under authority of the order of the Senate of 03/23/2013. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
SR46 (Related) 2013-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/92/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres92/BILLS-113sres92pcs.pdf |