US SR80 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-03-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1955)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes the importance of middle level education and the contributions of the individuals who educate middle level students. Encourages people to observe National Middle Level Education Month by visiting and celebrating schools that are responsible for educating young adolescents in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing support for the designation of March 2013 as "National Middle Level Education Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-19SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1955)

Same As/Similar To

HR100 (Related) 2013-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR383 (Related) 2014-03-13 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1661)
HR521 (Related) 2014-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback