US SR59 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-27 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Committee on Finance from March 1, 2013, through September 30, 2013.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Baucus. Without written report. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S946-947) |
Same As/Similar To
SR249 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/59/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres59/BILLS-113sres59is.pdf |