US SR548 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5650; text as passed Senate: CR S5635)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5650; text as passed Senate: CR S5635)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates November 29, 2014, as Small Business Saturday. Expresses support for efforts to: (1) encourage consumers to shop locally, and (2) increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses and the impact of such businesses on the U.S. economy.
Title
A resolution designating November 29, 2014, as "Small Business Saturday" and supporting efforts to increase awareness of the value of locally owned small businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-16 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5650; text as passed Senate: CR S5635) |
Same As/Similar To
HR410 (Related) 2013-11-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HR728 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SR313 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8573)
HR728 (Related) 2014-09-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SR313 (Related) 2013-12-09 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S8573)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Retail and wholesale trades
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/548/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres548/BILLS-113sres548ats.pdf |