US SR530 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-13)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5878; text as passed Senate: CR S5878)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5878; text as passed Senate: CR S5878)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms the Senate's commitment to promoting and protecting religious freedom around the world. Calls on the Department of State to work with the Kurdistan Regional Government, the Iraqi government, neighboring countries, the diaspora community in the United States, and other key stakeholders to address the plight of Iraqi minority groups seeking protection from persecution in Iraq. Requests the government of Iraq to prioritize the issue of protecting religious minorities and enact and enforce laws protecting religious freedom. Urges the President to ensure timely visa processing for Iraq's minority groups fleeing religious persecution.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on the current situation in Iraq and the urgent need to protect religious minorities from persecution from the terrorist group the Islamic State of Iraq and the Levant (ISIL).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5878; text as passed Senate: CR S5878) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 575. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2014-09-08 | Senate | S.AMDT.3783 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2014-09-08 | Senate | S.AMDT.3784 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2014-09-08 | Senate | S.AMDT.3785 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5141) |
Same As/Similar To
HR663 (Related) 2014-09-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Visas and passports
Human rights
International affairs
Iraq
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Visas and passports