US SR49 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes expenditures by the Senate Special Committee on Aging from March 1, 2013, through September 30, 2013. Requires the Special Committee to report its findings, together with such recommendations for legislation as it deems advisable, to the Senate at the earliest practicable date, but by February 28, 2015.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by the Special Committee on Aging.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Special Committee on Aging. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Nelson. Without written report. (text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S875) |
Same As/Similar To
SR241 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/49/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres49/BILLS-113sres49is.pdf |