US SB953 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 143. (consideration: CR S3977-3978)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 143. (consideration: CR S3977-3978)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Student Loan Affordability Act - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend until June 30, 2015, existing interest rates for loans made to undergraduate students under the Federal Direct Stafford Loan program. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify rules for required distributions from tax-exempt pension plans to an employee who dies before such employee's entire interest is distributed to require such interest to be distributed within five years after the death of such employee, subject to exceptions for an eligible designated beneficiary and surviving spouse of such employee. Defines "eligible designated beneficiary" to include a disabled or chronically-ill individual. Exempts from such modification a binding annuity contract in effect on the enactment date of this Act. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) limit the deductibility of interest payments made by a corporation which is an expatriated entity to a related person; (2) expand the definition of "crude oil" for purposes of the excise tax on petroleum to include crude oil condensates, natural gasoline, any bitumen or bituminous mixture, and any oil derived from a bitumen or bituminous mixture; (3) eliminate the requirement that such crude oil be produced in a well located in the United States; and (4) make permanent the Oil Spill Liability Trust Fund financing rate. Exempts the budgetary effects of this Act from the requirements of specified PAYGO scorecards.
Title
Student Loan Affordability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - On the Cloture Motion S. 953 (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 46. Record Vote Number: 143. (consideration: CR S3977-3978) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S3949; text: CR S3949) |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure, by unanimous consent, made in Senate. (consideration: CR S3949) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 74. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Employee benefits and pensions
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Water quality
Employee benefits and pensions
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Student aid and college costs
Taxation
Water quality