US SB42 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Engrossed on November 12 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2013-11-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2013 - Amends the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act of 2004 to prohibit an employer from discharging, demoting, suspending, harassing, or in any other manner discriminating against an employee, contractor, subcontractor, or agent of such employer who: (1) provided information to the employer or the federal government concerning a violation of antitrust law or of another criminal law committed in conjunction with a potential violation of antitrust law or in conjunction with an antitrust investigation by the Department of Justice (DOJ); or (2) filed, testified, participated, or otherwise assisted in an investigation relating to such a violation. Excludes from such protection any individual who planned and initiated such a violation or an obstruction to the investigation of such a violation. Authorizes an individual who alleges discharge or other discrimination by an employer in violation of such prohibition to seek relief: (1) by filing a complaint with the Secretary of Labor; or (2) if the Secretary has not issued a final decision within 180 days of such filing, by bringing an action at law or equity in the appropriate U.S. district court. Entitles an individual who prevails in any such action to all relief necessary to make such individual whole, including reinstatement with the same status, back pay plus interest, and compensation for special damages sustained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Antitrust Anti-Retaliation Act of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-12HouseHeld at the desk.
2013-11-12HouseReceived in the House.
2013-11-05SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2013-11-04SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7799-7800; text as passed Senate: CR S7799-7800)
2013-10-31SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 233.
2013-10-31SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2013-10-31SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2013-01-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S156-157)
2013-01-22SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S156)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback