US SB3472 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Big Oil Bailout Prevention Unlimited Liability Act of 2010 - Amends the Oil Pollution Act of 1990 to make the party responsible for an offshore facility, except a deepwater port, from which oil is discharged into or upon navigable waters or adjoining shorelines liable for all discharge removal costs and damages for each incident (under current law such party is liable for the total of all removal costs plus $75 million). Makes this Act effective on April 15, 2010.
Title
Big Oil Bailout Prevention Unlimited Liability Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Russell Feingold [D-WI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Edward Kaufman [D-DE] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5214 (Related) 2010-05-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB3305 (Related) 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
HB5355 (Related) 2010-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB3663 (Related) 2010-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
SB3305 (Related) 2010-08-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
HB5355 (Related) 2010-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB3663 (Related) 2010-07-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 493.
Subjects
Accidents
Environmental protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Water quality
Environmental protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3472/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3472/BILLS-111s3472is.pdf |