US SB344 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) from authorizing or otherwise allowing the introduction into commerce of gasoline that contains greater than 10-volume-percent ethanol, including by granting a waiver for new fuels and fuel additives from the Clean Air Act's fuel standards. Nullifies any waiver granted under such Act before this Act's enactment that allows for the introduction into commerce of gasoline containing greater than 10-volume-percent ethanol for use in motor vehicles, including the waivers entitled: (1) "Partial Grant and Partial Denial of Clean Air Act Waiver Application Submitted by Growth Energy To Increase the Allowable Ethanol Content of Gasoline to 15 Percent; Decision of the Administrator" (published on November 4, 2010), and (2) "Partial Grant of Clean Air Act Waiver Application Submitted by Growth Energy To Increase the Allowable Ethanol Content of Gasoline to 15 Percent; Decision of the Administrator" (published on January 26, 2011). Nullifies, 60 days after this Act's enactment, the portions of the rule entitled "Regulation to Mitigate the Misfueling of Vehicles and Engines with Gasoline Containing Greater Than Ten Volume Percent Ethanol and Modifications to the Reformulated and Conventional Gasoline Programs" (published on July 25, 2011) to mitigate misfueling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency from approving the introduction into commerce of gasoline that contains greater than 10-volume-percent ethanol, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB1462 (Related) 2013-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
HB1469 (Related) 2013-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback