US SB3422 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Billfish Conservation Act of 2012 - Prohibits any person from offering billfish or billfish products for sale, selling them, or having custody, control, or possession of them for purposes of offering them for sale or selling them. Treats a violation of this Act as an act prohibited by the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act. Subjects a person to a maximum civil penalty of $100,000 for each violation, with each day of a continuing violation constituting a separate offense. Exempts the state of Hawaii and the Pacific Insular Area, except that billfish may be sold under such exemption only in the United States and the Pacific Insular Area. Defines "billfish" as any of the following: (1) blue marlin, (2) striped marlin, (3) black marlin, (4) sailfish, (5) shortbill spearfish, (6) white marlin, (7) roundscale spearfish, (8) Mediterranean spearfish, or (9) longbill spearfish. Excludes swordfish from such definition.
Title
Billfish Conservation Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2706 (Related) 2012-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 112-183.
SB1451 (Related) 2011-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3424 (Related) 2012-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
SB1451 (Related) 2011-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3424 (Related) 2012-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Fishes
Hawaii
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates
Hawaii
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Trade restrictions
U.S. territories and protectorates
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3422/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3422/BILLS-112s3422is.pdf |