US SB2581 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-311.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2014 - Directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) to promulgate a rule requiring liquid nicotine containers to be designed with special packaging that is difficult for children under five years of age to open or to obtain harmful contents from.
Title
Child Nicotine Poisoning Prevention Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Senate | By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 113-311. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 571. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. Without written report. |
2014-09-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4406) |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4406) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5486 (Same As) 2014-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Product safety and quality
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Consumer Product Safety Commission
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Product safety and quality