US SB2226 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WaterSense Efficiency, Conservation, and Adaptation Act of 2014 - Establishes within the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) a WaterSense program to identify and promote water efficient products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services so as to: reduce water use; reduce the strain on water, wastewater, and stormwater infrastructure; conserve energy used to pump, heat, transport, and treat water; and preserve water resources through the voluntary labeling of, or other forms of communications about, products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services that meet the highest water efficiency and performance criteria. Requires the Administrator of EPA to identify other voluntary approaches to encourage recycling and reuse technologies to improve water efficiency or lower water use and to implement those approaches, if appropriate.Establishes a State Residential Water Efficiency and Conservation Incentives Program to provide financial incentives for consumers to purchase and install products, buildings, landscapes, facilities, processes, and services labeled under the WaterSense program. Requires the Administrator to make grants to owners or operators of water systems to address, mitigate, and adapt to address any ongoing or forecasted impact of climate change on the water quality or quantity of a U.S. region.
Title
WaterSense Efficiency, Conservation, and Adaptation Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5150 (Same As) 2014-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
HB5363 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2771 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB5363 (Related) 2014-09-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB2771 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Consumer affairs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Housing industry and standards
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Consumer affairs
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Housing industry and standards
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2226/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2226/BILLS-113s2226is.pdf |