US SB2213 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Consumer Financial Protection Commission Act of 2014 - Amends the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010, title X of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act, to replace the position of Director of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (CFPB) with a five-member Commission whose members are appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate. Prohibits the Chair of the Commission from making requests for estimates related to appropriations without the prior approval of the Commission.
Title
Consumer Financial Protection Commission Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Related) 2013-10-29 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
HB2446 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB3193 (Related) 2014-03-04 - Received in the Senate.
SB205 (Related) 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
HB2446 (Related) 2014-02-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB3193 (Related) 2014-03-04 - Received in the Senate.
SB205 (Related) 2013-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced in Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Subjects
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2213/BILLS-113s2213is.pdf |