US SB220 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Citrus Disease Research and Development Trust Fund Act of 2013 - Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to establish the Citrus Disease Research and Development Trust Fund, consisting of revenues from duties paid on imported citrus or citrus products, to support scientific research, technical assistance, and development activities to combat both domestic and invasive citrus diseases and pests harming the United States. Establishes the Citrus Disease Research and Development Trust Fund Advisory Board. Makes Fund amounts available to the Secretary of Agriculture to develop a coordinated program of research and product development relating to: (1) scientific research of both domestic and invasive diseases and pests afflicting the citrus industry; and (2) support for the dissemination and commercialization of relevant information, techniques, and technologies discovered through Fund research or other research projects intended to solve problems caused by citrus production diseases and invasive pests. Requires the President to notify certain congressional committees before entering into a trade agreement that could result in a decrease in the amount of: (1) duties paid on imported citrus or citrus products, and (2) funds transferred into the Fund. Prescribes a formula for required estimated tax payments otherwise due in each of the quarters of 2018 from corporations with assets of at least $1 billion. Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (COBRA) to extend certain customs users fees for the processing of merchandise entered into the United States between October 23, 2021, and November 6, 2021, and other specified customs users fees for merchandise entered between October 30, 2021, and November 13, 2021.
Title
Citrus Disease Research and Development Trust Fund Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB853 (Same As) 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture.
SB1331 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1331 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Agricultural research
Agricultural trade
Animal and plant health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Fruit and vegetables
Government trust funds
Pest management
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Tariffs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Trade agreements and negotiations
User charges and fees
Agricultural research
Agricultural trade
Animal and plant health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Customs enforcement
Foreign trade and international finance
Fruit and vegetables
Government trust funds
Pest management
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Tariffs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Trade agreements and negotiations
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/220/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s220/BILLS-113s220is.pdf |