US SB1981 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open Internet Preservation Act of 2014 - Restores rules adopted by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) in the Report and Order in the matter of preserving the open Internet and broadband industry practices (adopted on December 21, 2010) that were vacated by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit in Verizon v. Federal Communications Commission (decided on January 14, 2014). Requires such rules to remain in effect until the FCC takes final action in the proceedings remanded to the FCC in such D.C. Circuit decision.
Title
Open Internet Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3982 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB5429 (Related) 2014-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
HB5429 (Related) 2014-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1981/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1981/BILLS-113s1981is.pdf |