US SB1934 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-26 - Became Public Law No: 113-194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clifford P. Hansen Federal Courthouse Conveyance Act - Directs the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to offer to convey to Teton County, Wyoming, the parcel of land located at 145 East Simpson Street, Jackson, Wyoming, and the building on such land known as the Clifford P. Hansen Federal Courthouse. Directs the Administrator to require the County to pay: (1) nominal consideration for the parcel, and (2) fair market value for the building. Allows the Administrator, in lieu of the County's payment for the building, to accept any credits or waivers against lease payments, amounts expended by the County under facility maintenance agreements, or other charges for the continued occupancy or use by the federal government. Requires the deed for conveyance to include a covenant providing that the parcel and building will be for public use. Requires proceeds from the conveyance to be paid into the Federal Buildings Fund.
Title
Clifford P. Hansen Federal Courthouse Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-26 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-194. |
2014-11-26 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-11-17 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-11-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7913) |
2014-11-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1934. |
2014-11-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7913-7914) |
2014-11-12 | House | Mr. Meadows moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2014-09-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5460-5461; text as passed Senate: CR S5460) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Subjects
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Land transfers
Wyoming
Government operations and politics
Land transfers
Wyoming