US SB1844 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military Retirement Restoration Act - Repeals the provision of the Bipartisan Budget Act of 2013 that reduces the cost-of-living adjustment to the retirement pay of members of the Armed Forces under age 62. Amends the Internal Revenue Code to treat a foreign corporation managed and controlled, directly or indirectly, primarily in the United States as a domestic corporation for U.S. tax purposes if the stock of such corporation is regularly traded on an established securities market or the aggregate gross assets of such corporation during the taxable year or any preceding taxable year is $50 million or more.
Title
Military Retirement Restoration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3793 (Same As) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB694 (Related) 2013-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1554 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to House Financial Services
HB1555 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3666 (Related) 2013-12-05 - Referred to House Budget
SB250 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB268 (Related) 2013-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1533 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3788 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3801 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1963 (Related) 2014-02-12 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 298.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1977 (Related) 2014-02-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 300.
HB3790 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3792 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3794 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3797 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3798 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3804 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3807 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1856 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1869 (Related) 2013-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3787 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB1931 (Related) 2014-01-16 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
SB1930 (Related) 2014-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB4134 (Related) 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB5338 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
HB694 (Related) 2013-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1554 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to House Financial Services
HB1555 (Related) 2013-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3666 (Related) 2013-12-05 - Referred to House Budget
SB250 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB268 (Related) 2013-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1533 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3788 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3801 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1963 (Related) 2014-02-12 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 298.
SB1950 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S736)
SB1977 (Related) 2014-02-03 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 300.
HB3790 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3792 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3794 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3797 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3798 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3804 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3807 (Related) 2014-01-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB1856 (Related) 2013-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1869 (Related) 2013-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3787 (Related) 2014-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
SB1931 (Related) 2014-01-16 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 296.
SB1930 (Related) 2014-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB4134 (Related) 2014-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB5338 (Related) 2014-07-31 - Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Inflation and prices
Military personnel and dependents
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income
U.S. and foreign investments
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Corporate finance and management
Department of the Treasury
Foreign and international corporations
Inflation and prices
Military personnel and dependents
Taxation
Taxation of foreign income
U.S. and foreign investments
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1844/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1844/BILLS-113s1844is.pdf |