US SB1827 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.) American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act - Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a congressional gold medal to the American Fighter Aces, collectively, in recognition of their heroic military service and defense of the nation's freedom. Requires the medal to be given to the Smithsonian Institution, where it shall be available for display or temporary loan to be displayed elsewhere, particularly at locations associated with the American Fighter Aces.
Title
American Fighter Aces Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-03-27 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-03-27 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1779) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1778-1779) |
2013-12-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB685 (Related) 2014-05-23 - Became Public Law No: 113-105.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Aviation and airports
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Aviation and airports
Congressional tributes
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution