US SB1821 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - See also H.R. 3771.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - See also H.R. 3771.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act - Treats cash contributions made after the enactment of this Act and before April 15, 2014, for the relief of victims in areas affected by Typhoon Haiyan as having been made on December 31, 2013, for purposes of the tax deduction for charitable contributions. Deems such a contribution as meeting the recordkeeping requirements of the Internal Revenue Code if the taxpayer produces a telephone bill showing the name of the donee organization and the date and amount of the contribution.
Title
Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | See also H.R. 3771. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed by Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1706) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1369) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S.AMDT.2806 Amendment SA 2806 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S.AMDT.2806 Amendment SA 2806 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Hirono. (consideration: CR S1369; text: CR S1369)To change the dates during which contributions may be made to be treated as made in 2013, and for other purposes. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1369) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3771 (Related) 2014-03-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-92.
Subjects
Asia
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Income tax deductions
Philippines
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Income tax deductions
Philippines
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Taxation