US SB182 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 629.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 629.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anchorage Land Conveyance Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the city of Anchorage, Alaska, the reversionary interests of the United States in specified parcels of non-federal land in order to unencumber the title to such land to enable the economic development of such land. Requires the city to pay all costs associated with such conveyance.
Title
Anchorage Land Conveyance Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 629. |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-289. |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2013-11-20 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-342. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S404-405) |
Same As/Similar To
HB585 (Same As) 2013-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
HB2954 (Related) 2014-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.