US SB1494 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Reauthorization Act of 2012 - Reauthorizes and revises the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to appoint 28 directors (currently, 23) who are knowledgeable and experienced in matters relating to conservation of fish, wildlife, or other natural resources and represent a balance of expertise in ocean, coastal, freshwater, and terrestrial resource conservation. Removes limitations on the appointment of such Foundation's officers and employees. Requires the Foundation's Executive Director to be appointed by and serve at the direction of the Board as the chief executive officer and to be knowledgeable and experienced in matters relating to fish and wildlife conservation. Gives the Foundation the power to receive and administer restitution and community service payments, amounts for mitigation of impacts to natural resources, and other amounts arising from legal, regulatory, or administrative proceedings, subject to the condition that the amounts are received or administered for purposes that further the conservation and management of fish, wildlife, plants, and other natural resources. Repeals provisions authorizing the Foundation to establish a national whale conservation endowment fund. Authorizes appropriations for the Foundation for FY2012-FY2017. Authorizes the Foundation to: (1) assess and collect fees for the management of amounts received from federal agencies, and (2) use such federal funds for matching contributions made by private persons, state and local agencies, and other entities (current law requires such use).
Title
National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Reauthorization Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517. |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer with amendments. With written report No. 112-215. |
2012-07-25 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Water and Wildlife. Hearings held. |
2011-08-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
HB6441 (Related) 2012-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
HB6441 (Related) 2012-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Subjects
Environmental protection
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection