US SB1463 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 650.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Captive Primate Safety Act - Amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to add nonhuman primates to the definition of "prohibited wildlife species" for purposes of the prohibition against the sale or purchase of such species in interstate or foreign commerce. Makes it unlawful for a person to import, export, transport, sell, receive, acquire, or purchase a live animal of any prohibited wildlife species in interstate or foreign commerce (i.e., for pet trade purposes). Modifies exceptions to such prohibition, including by making it inapplicable to a person who is: (1) a licensed and inspected person who does not allow direct contact between the public and prohibited wildlife species, and (2) transporting a single primate of the genus Cebus that was obtained from and trained by a charitable organization to assist a permanently disabled individual with a severe mobility impairment. Sets forth civil and criminal penalties for violations of the requirements of this Act.
Title
Captive Primate Safety Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 650. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. With written report No. 113-308. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2856 (Same As) 2013-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Department of the Interior
Disability assistance
Mammals
Smuggling and trafficking
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Department of the Interior
Disability assistance
Mammals
Smuggling and trafficking
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection