US SB1456 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a congressional gold medal in honor of President Shimon Peres of Israel.
Title
A bill to award the Congressional Gold Medal to Shimon Peres.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-03-14 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-03-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1667) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S.AMDT.2851 Amendment SA 2851 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | S.AMDT.2851 Amendment SA 2851 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Bennet. (consideration: CR S1667; text: CR S1667)To make a technical correction. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1666-1667) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2939 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-114.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Israel
Middle East
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
Israel
Middle East