US SB1447 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water and Power Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
New Mexico Navajo Water Settlement Technical Corrections Act - (Sec. 2) Amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to expand the current authorization for the construction or rehabilitation and operation and maintenance of conjunctive use wells in the San Juan River Basin, Little Colorado River Basin, and Rio Grande Basin in New Mexico to include the planning and design of those wells. Revises the percentages of funds authorized for the Navajo-Gallup Water Supply Project, conjunctive use wells, and San Juan River Irrigation Projects that may be made available for specified purposes by: increasing from 2% to 4% the portion of funds that may be used for the survey, recovery, protection, preservation, and display of archaeological resources in the area of a Project facility or conjunctive use well; and decreasing from 4% to 2% the portion of funds that may be used for purchasing land and constructing and maintaining facilities to mitigate the loss of, and improve conditions for the propagation of, fish and wildlife. Makes technical corrections.
Title
New Mexico Navajo Water Settlement Technical Corrections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2014-12-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-12-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6355; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S6355; text as passed Senate: CR S6355) |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Tester under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with an amendment and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 113-246. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-143. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3564 (Same As) 2013-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Subjects
Historical and cultural resources
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
New Mexico
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
New Mexico
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection