US SB1186 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-31 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Essex National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act - Amends the Omnibus Parks and Public Lands Management Act of 1996 to: (1) extend the authority for the Secretary of the Interior to make grants or provide assistance respecting the Essex National Heritage Area until September 30, 2027, and (2) increase the total amount that may be appropriated for the Area under the Act to $20 million.
Title
Essex National Heritage Area Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. William Cowan [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2568 (Same As) 2013-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1186/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1186/BILLS-113s1186is.pdf |