US HR766 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5771) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend certain expiring provisions and make technical corrections, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 647) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the tax treatment of ABLE accounts established under State programs for the care of family members with disabilities.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5771) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend certain expiring provisions and make technical corrections, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 647) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for the tax treatment of ABLE accounts established under State programs for the care of family members with disabilities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 192 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-03 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 192 (Roll no. 540). (text: CR H8305-8306) |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8310) |
2014-12-03 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 766, the Chair announced that further proceedings on adoption would be postponed. |
2014-12-03 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H8309) |
2014-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 766. |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8305-8309) |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 147. |
2014-12-02 | House | The rule provides for a closed rule for H.R. 5771 and H.R. 647. |
2014-12-02 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-643, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Related) 2015-01-02 - LAID ON THE TABLE - Without objection, the Chair announced that H.R. 647 is laid on the table.
HB5771 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-295.
HB5771 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-295.