US HR723 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the celebration of Hispanic Heritage Month. Esteems the integral role of Latinos and their manifold heritage in the economy, culture, and identity of the United States.
Title
Recognizing Hispanic Heritage Month and celebrating the heritage and culture of Latinos in the United States and the immense contributions of Latinos to the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D-TX] |
Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] |
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SR545 (Related) 2014-09-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR363 (Related) 2013-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR246 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6672; text as passed Senate: CR S6663)
HR363 (Related) 2013-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR246 (Related) 2013-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6672; text as passed Senate: CR S6663)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Historical and cultural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/723/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres723/BILLS-113hres723ih.pdf |