US HR646 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 123.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 123.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Attorney General to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any electronic communications in the possession of the Attorney General or the Department of Justice (DOJ) that were transmitted to or from any electronic mail accounts used by Lois Lerner, former Director of the Exempt Organizations Division of the Internal Revenue Service (IRS), between January 1, 2009, and April 30, 2011.
Title
Directing the Attorney General to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any emails in the possession of the Department of Justice that were transmitted to or from the email account(s) of former Internal Revenue Service Exempt Organizations Division Director Lois Lerner between January 2009 and April 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 123. |
2014-07-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-545. |
2014-07-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-07-15 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged. |
2014-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR645 (Related) 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
HR647 (Related) 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
HR648 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR649 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 125.
HR647 (Related) 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
HR648 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR649 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 125.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Department of Justice
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House of Representatives
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Department of Justice
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House of Representatives
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation