US HR645 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the President to transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any electronic communications in the possession of the President or the Executive Office of the President that were transmitted to or from any electronic mail accounts used by Lois Lerner, former Director of the Exempt Organizations Division of the Internal Revenue Service (IRS), between January 1, 2009, and April 30, 2011.
Title
Requesting that the President of the United States transmit to the House of Representatives copies of any emails in the possession of the Executive Office of the President that were transmitted to or from the email account(s) of former Internal Revenue Service Exempt Organizations Division Director Lois Lerner between January 2009 and April 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 121. |
2014-07-17 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 113-524. |
2014-07-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-07-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HR646 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 123.
HR647 (Related) 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
HR648 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR649 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 125.
HR647 (Related) 2014-07-17 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
HR648 (Related) 2014-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR649 (Related) 2014-07-22 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 125.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House of Representatives
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
House of Representatives
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation