US HR605 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month (May) as an important time to celebrate the contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to our nation's history. Recognizes that Asian American and Pacific Islander communities enhance the rich diversity of the United States.
Title
Recognizing the significance of Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month in May as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans and Pacific Islanders to the Nation's history.
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Xavier Becerra [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HR189 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR129 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3878)
SR460 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3308-3309; text as passed Senate: CR S3301-3302)
SR129 (Related) 2013-05-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3878)
SR460 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3308-3309; text as passed Senate: CR S3301-3302)
Subjects
Asia
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/605/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres605/BILLS-113hres605ih.pdf |