US HR562 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms that it is U.S. policy to support the Republic of Moldova's sovereignty, independence, and territorial integrity. Supports the Strategic Dialogue as a means to strengthen relations between the Republic of Moldova and the United States and enhance the democratic, economic, rule of law, and security reforms being implemented by the Republic of Moldova. Encourages the President and the Department of State to enhance U.S. cooperation with the government of Moldova and civil society organizations. Affirms the Republic of Moldova's sovereign right to determine its own partnerships free of external coercion and affirms Moldova's right to associate with the European Union (EU) or any regional organization. Calls upon the Government of Russia to: (1) withdraw its military forces from within the internationally recognized territory of the Republic of Moldova, (2) refrain from economic threats, and (3) cease actions that support separatist movements in Moldova. Supports: (1) confidence-building measures between the government of Moldova and the authorities in the Transnistria region in order to secure a peaceful resolution to the conflict; and (2) efforts to resolve the Transnistria issue through a settlement that affirms Moldova's sovereignty and territorial integrity, while providing a special status for the Transnistrian region within Moldova. Urges officials in the Transnistrian region to allow Organization for Security and Cooperation in Europe monitors unrestricted access to the region. Affirms that lasting stability and security in Europe is a key U.S. priority that can only be achieved if the territorial integrity and sovereignty of all European countries is respected.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect to enhanced relations with the Republic of Moldova and support for Moldova's territorial integrity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | H.AMDT.1126 On agreeing to the Smith (NJ) amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | H.AMDT.1126 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Smith (NJ). (consideration: CR H6837; text: CR H6837)Amendment inserts a new preamble. |
2014-07-25 | House | H.AMDT.1125 On agreeing to the Smith (NJ) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | H.AMDT.1125 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Smith (NJ). (consideration: CR H6836-6837; text: CR H6836-6837)Amendment strikes all after the resolving clause and inserts a complete new text. |
2014-07-25 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6836-6837; text of measure as introduced in House: CR H6836) |
2014-07-25 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2014-07-25 | House | Mr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2014-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-05-07 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3456-3457) |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR478 (Related) 2014-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3813-3814)
SR500 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4845)
SR500 (Related) 2014-07-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4845)
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Conflicts and wars
Cultural exchanges and relations
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Military operations and strategy
Moldova
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Conflicts and wars
Cultural exchanges and relations
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Military operations and strategy
Moldova
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine