US HR540 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week. Recognizes the contributions of nurses to the U.S. health care system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week on May 6, 2014, through May 12, 2014.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] |
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR201 (Same As) 2013-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/540/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres540/BILLS-113hres540ih.pdf |