US HR524 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1459) to ensure that the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 applies to the declaration of national monuments, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1459) to ensure that the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 applies to the declaration of national monuments, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 227 N: 190 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 230 N: 187 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 230 N: 187 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-03-26 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 190 (Roll no. 143). (text: CR H2660-2661) |
2014-03-26 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 187 (Roll no. 142). (consideration: CR H2668, H2669) |
2014-03-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2669-2670) |
2014-03-26 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 524, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Polis demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2014-03-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 524. |
2014-03-26 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2660-2668) |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92. |
2014-03-25 | House | The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The resolution makes in order only those amendments printed in the report. Each amendment may be offered only in the order printed in the report, may be offered only by a Member designated in the report, shall be considered as read, shall be debatable for the time specified in the report equally divided and controlled by the proponent and an opponent, shall not be subject to amendment, and shall not be subject to a demand for division of the question in the House or the Committee Section 2 of the resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of March 27, 2014, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules relating to a measure addressing the Medicare payment system for physicians and a measure addressing Ukraine. |
2014-03-25 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-385, by Mr. Bishop (UT). |
Same As/Similar To
HB1459 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.