US HR503 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that it should be U.S. policy to encourage and facilitate: (1) implementation of the January 23, 2014, cessation of hostilities agreement between the government of South Sudan and the Sudan People's Liberation Movement/Army in Opposition, (2) efforts to disarm and reintegrate armed groups in South Sudan, (3) elevation of the U.S. government's presence at the Addis Ababa-based peace negotiations, (4) observance of the rule of law leading to either the lawful prosecution or unconditional release of all arrested political leaders, (5) negotiation of a political framework for governance until the next general elections, (6) creation of a framework for security sector reform, (7) support for the African Union Commission of Inquiry into atrocities and human rights abuses committed during the current conflict in South Sudan, (8) support for a South Sudan version of a Truth and Reconciliation Commission, and (9) U.S. financial support to meet humanitarian needs and provide for capacity building.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the need to bring the South Sudan conflict to a sustainable and lasting end and to promote reconciliation of longstanding and recent grievances to allow for a peaceful society with good governance.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2014-06-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Africa
Arms control and nonproliferation
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military command and structure
Militias and paramilitary groups
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Arms control and nonproliferation
Conflicts and wars
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Military command and structure
Militias and paramilitary groups
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
South Sudan
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sudan
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/503/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres503/BILLS-113hres503ih.pdf |