US HR493 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for: (1) the designation of Rare Disease Day; and (2) a national and global commitment to improving access to, and developing new treatments, diagnostics, and cures for, rare diseases and disorders.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of February 28, 2014, as "Rare Disease Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR91 (Same As) 2013-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR57 (Related) 2013-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S879-880; text as passed Senate: CR S878-879)
SR368 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1252-1253; text as passed Senate: CR S1238-1239)
SR57 (Related) 2013-02-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S879-880; text as passed Senate: CR S878-879)
SR368 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1252-1253; text as passed Senate: CR S1238-1239)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/493/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres493/BILLS-113hres493ih.pdf |