US HR442 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 120-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-12 - Referred to House House Administration
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-12 - Referred to House House Administration
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the House of Representatives to bring a civil action in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia for declaratory or injunctive relief to challenge any of the following policies or actions: the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) policy that, for health insurance coverage that is renewed for a policy year between January 1, 2014, and October 1, 2014, health insurance issuers may continue to offer coverage that would otherwise be terminated or cancelled for noncompliance with various requirements of title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act (relating to health insurance coverage, individual group market reforms, and general reforms) and corresponding portions of the Employee Retirement Income Security Act, and the Internal Revenue Code, as announced by the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services on November 14, 2013; the one-year delay in the application of the reporting requirements of the Code (and its related requirements with respect to shared responsibility for employers regarding health coverage), as provided under Department of the Treasury Notice 2013-45, as announced by the Department on July 2, 2013; the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) policy to exercise prosecutorial discretion for individuals who came to the United States as children, as announced by DHS on June 15, 2012; and the authorization, approval, renewal, modification, or extension of any experimental, pilot, or demonstration project under the Social Security Act (SSA) that waives compliance with any of its mandatory work requirements through a waiver of SSA state family assistance plan requirements. Derives any amounts obligated or expended by the House to carry out this resolution during a fiscal year from existing appropriations for House salaries and expenses for that fiscal year. Provides that nothing in this resolution may be construed as authorizing an increase in the amount of budget authority available to the House for that fiscal year.
Title
Directing the House of Representatives to bring a civil action for declaratory or injunctive relief to challenge certain policies and actions taken by the executive branch.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Rules, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Civil actions and liability
Comprehensive health care
Congress
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
House of Representatives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Presidents and presidential powers
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Border security and unlawful immigration
Civil actions and liability
Comprehensive health care
Congress
Congressional-executive branch relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
House of Representatives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Presidents and presidential powers
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/442/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres442/BILLS-113hres442ih.pdf |