US HR147 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 80-17)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns the government of Iran for its persecution of religious minorities, including Saeed Abedini (a U.S. citizen sentenced to prison in Iran after being tried for his religious beliefs and convicted for undermining the government of Iran). Calls on: (1) Iran to release Saeed Abedini to the United States; and (2) the U.S. government to work aggressively for his release by designating appropriate Iranian officials for human rights abuses pursuant to the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010.
Title
Calling for the release of United States citizen Saeed Abedini and condemning the Government of Iran for its persecution of religious minorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-11-13 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2013-11-13 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR284 (Related) 2013-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8070)
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Religion
Sanctions
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Religion
Sanctions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/147/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres147/BILLS-113hres147ih.pdf |