US HCR108 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Clerk of the House of the Representatives to make corrections in the enrollment of H.B. 5021 (Highway and Transportation Funding Act of 2014) by prohibiting the budgetary effects of that Act and its amendments from being entered on the PAYGO scorecards of either the House of Representatives or of the Senate.
Title
Providing for the correction of the enrollment of H.B. 5021.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate, pursuant to the order of 7/23/2014, without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5039) |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-07-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H6391) |
2014-07-17 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6391) |
2014-07-17 | House | Mr. Chaffetz asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5021 (Related) 2014-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 113-159.