US HB991 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-5)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act of 2011 - Amends the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to direct the Secretary of the Interior to issue a permit for the importation of any polar bear part (other than an internal organ) from a polar bear taken in a sport hunt in Canada to any person: (1) who submits proof that the polar bear was legally harvested before February 18, 1997; or (2) who has submitted, in support of an application submitted before May 15, 2008, proof that the bear was legally harvested before such date from a polar bear population from which a sport-hunted trophy could be imported before such date. (Polar bears were listed as a threatened species by the Department of the Interior on May 14, 2008.)
Title
Polar Bear Conservation and Fairness Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Steve Austria [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Jeffrey Landry [R-LA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Ross [D-AR] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 208. |
2011-12-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-308. |
2011-10-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2011-10-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-10-05 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2011-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2011-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Related) 2011-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4089 (Related) 2012-04-18 - Received in the Senate.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
HB4089 (Related) 2012-04-18 - Received in the Senate.
SB3525 (Related) 2012-11-26 - Returned to the Calendar. Calendar No. 504.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Canada
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Mammals
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions
Animals
Canada
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Mammals
Outdoor recreation
Trade restrictions