US HB979 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-21)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forest Products Fairness Act of 2013 - Amends the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to include in the definition of "biobased product" forest products that meet biobased content requirements, notwithstanding the market share the product holds, the product's age, or whether the market for the product is new or emerging. Defines "forest product" as a product made from materials derived from the practice of forestry or the management of growing timber, including: (1) pulp, paper, paperboard, pellets, and wood products; and (2) any recycled products derived from forest materials.
Title
Forest Products Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Same As) 2013-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Agricultural practices and innovations
Agriculture and food
Alternative and renewable resources
Energy research
Forests, forestry, trees
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Agriculture and food
Alternative and renewable resources
Energy research
Forests, forestry, trees
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/979/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr979/BILLS-113hr979ih.pdf |