US HB935 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 56-6)
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing Regulatory Burdens Act of 2013 - Amends the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act (FIFRA) and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act [CWA]) to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) or a state from requiring a permit under the CWA for a discharge from a point source into navigable waters of a pesticide authorized for sale, distribution, or use under FIFRA, or the residue of such a pesticide, resulting from the application of such pesticide. Exempts from such prohibition the following discharges containing a pesticide or pesticide residue: (1) a discharge resulting from the application of a pesticide in violation of FIFRA that is relevant to protecting water quality, if the discharge would not have occurred but for the violation or the amount of pesticide or pesticide residue contained in the discharge is greater than would have occurred without the violation; (2) stormwater discharges regulated under the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (NPDES); and (3) discharges regulated under NPDES of manufacturing or industrial effluent or treatment works effluent and discharges incidental to the normal operation of a vessel, including a discharge resulting from ballasting operations or vessel biofouling prevention.
Title
Reducing Regulatory Burdens Act of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-31 - House - On Passage (Y: 267 N: 161 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 195 N: 233 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-07-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 253 N: 148 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-07-31 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 195 N: 233 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-07-28 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 253 N: 148 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2014-07-31 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 267 - 161 (Roll no. 470). |
2014-07-31 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 195 - 233 (Roll no. 469). |
2014-07-31 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7150) |
2014-07-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Capps motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a new section at the end of the bill protecting infants and children from known or suspected carcinogens. |
2014-07-31 | House | Mrs. Capps moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Transportation. (consideration: CR H7149-7150; text: CR H7149) |
2014-07-31 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7149-7152) |
2014-07-30 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair announced that pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, further proceedingson H.R. 935 would be postponed. |
2014-07-30 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7108) |
2014-07-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 935. |
2014-07-30 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of both H. Res. 676 and H.R. 935 in the House. Both measures are debatable for one hour. |
2014-07-30 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 694. (consideration: CR H7100-7108; text of measure as reported in House: CR H7100) |
2014-07-30 | House | Rule H. Res. 694 passed House. |
2014-07-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 694 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of both H. Res. 676 and H.R. 935 in the House. Both measures are debatable for one hour. |
2014-07-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 253 - 148 (Roll no. 455). (text of measure as reported in House: CR H6870) |
2014-07-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6937-6938) |
2014-07-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-07-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 935. |
2014-07-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6870-6874) |
2014-07-28 | House | Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 346. |
2014-06-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 113-467, Part II. |
2014-06-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-467, Part I. |
2014-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-03-13 | House | Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture Discharged. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Horticulture, Research, Biotechnology, and Foreign Agriculture. |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB802 (Related) 2013-04-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR694 (Related) 2014-07-30 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 196 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H7058-7059)
HB1947 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR694 (Related) 2014-07-30 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 196 (Roll no. 466). (text: CR H7058-7059)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
State and local government operations
Water quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
State and local government operations
Water quality