US HB805 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-8)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Quality Improvement Organization Program Restoration Act - Amends the Trade Adjustment Assistance Extension Act of 2011 to repeal its revisions to requirements for contracts with Medicare Quality Improvement Organizations (QIOs). Amends title XI of the Social Security Act to specify expenditures or funding for: (1) 3-year QIO contracts for contract periods beginning on or after August 1, 2014, and ending on or before July 31, 2021, but with a certain reduction in aggregate funds payable after October 1, 2014; and (2) contracts with utilization and quality control peer review organizations for any contract period beginning on or after August 1, 2014.
Title
Quality Improvement Organization Program Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Joe Barton [R-TX] | Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] |
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] |
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/805/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr805/BILLS-113hr805ih.pdf |