US HB787 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Infrastructure Jobs and Energy Independence Act - Deems the Draft Proposed Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program 2010-2015 issued by the Secretary of the Interior to be approved as a final oil and gas leasing program under the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act (OCSLA). Deems the Secretary to have issued a final environmental impact statement for the Program under the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 (NEPA). Directs the Secretary to: (1) conduct a lease sale in each outer Continental Shelf (OCS) planning area for which there is a commercial interest in purchasing federal oil and gas production leases; (2) prepare an inventory of U.S. offshore energy resources; and (3) promulgate regulations concerning the production of oil or gas resources of the OCS, including regulating the installation of surface facilities, mitigating the impact of such facilities on coastal vistas, and allowing onshore facilities to draw upon such resources that are within 10 miles of shore. Extends from three geographical miles to nine nautical miles a coastal state's allowable seaward boundary. Repeals the moratorium on oil and gas leasing in: (1) any area east of the Military Mission Line in the Gulf of Mexico; (2) any area in the Eastern Planning Area that is within 125 miles of the Florida coastline; and (3) specified areas within the Central Planning Area and within 100 miles of the Florida coastline. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to issue a final leasing plan for the Eastern Gulf of Mexico for all areas where there exists commercial interest in purchasing federal oil and gas leases for production. Specifies revenue sharing percentages for sums received from leasing offshore pursuant to this Act, including 30% for producing states. Prohibits revenues collected from leases prior to this Act's enactment from being affected by this Act. Authorizes the President to waive requirements governing approval of oil and natural gas activity deemed important to national interests. Requires the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to: (1) publish a plan to exchange a specified amount of light grade petroleum from the Strategic Petroleum Reserve for heavy grade petroleum plus additional cash bonus bids that reflect the difference in market value between light grade and heavy grade petroleum and the timing of deliveries of heavy grade petroleum, and (2) deposit 90% of the remaining net proceeds from the exchange into the Infrastructure Renewal Reserve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Infrastructure Jobs and Energy Independence Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
2013-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2013-02-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2013-02-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2013-02-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Budget
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Rules
2013-02-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2013-02-15HouseReferred to House Natural Resources
2013-02-15HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Rules, the Budget, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Same As/Similar To

HB4956 (Related) 2014-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Aquaculture
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Department of the Interior
Education programs funding
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Gulf of Mexico
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Judicial procedure and administration
Judicial review and appeals
Labor standards
Legal fees and court costs
Legislative rules and procedure
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public transit
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
State and local finance
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Strategic materials and reserves
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Water quality
Water resources funding

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback