US HB710 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Committee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Committee Hearings Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a national commission on fiscal responsibility and reform, and for other purposes.
Title
Sustainable Budget Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-29 | House | Committee Hearings Held |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E91) |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB743 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/710/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr710/BILLS-118hr710ih.pdf |